DE HB230 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - HS 1 for HB 230 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - HS 1 for HB 230 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Labor
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Labor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-25 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-25 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-25 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Lifted From Table in House | |
2009-06-25 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-24 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-24 | HS 1 for HB 230 - Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-11 | Re-Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2009-06-16 | Introduced in House and assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House |