DE HB228 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Delaware law currently prohibits sampling and sale of craft beer, distilled spirits, and wine at Farmer’s Markets or Agricultural Themed Events. This bill allows holders of a “Farmer’s Market Permit or Agricultural Themed Event Permit” to conduct tastings and sell craft beer, mead, distilled spirits, and wine in sealed containers for off-premise consumption at retail prices at off-site farmers markets or agricultural themed events. This bill requires the Department of Agriculture to certify that the event is an Agricultural Themed Event or Farmers’ Market.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Beverages And Farmers' Markets And Other Agricultural Themed Events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 6 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 4 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |