DE HB223 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that when a motor vehicle is subject to a possessory lien either through towing or because of failure to make payment to a garage owner for services rendered to the motor vehicle, the possessory lien does not extend to personal property located in the motor vehicle, and such property shall be returned to the owner if the owner claims the items prior to the sale of such vehicle This Act also clarifies that abandoned personal property does not include personal property inside an abandoned motor vehicle if the owner of the personal property files an answer to a Petition seeking full title and interest to the personal property.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 21 And 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Possessory And Other Certain Liens On Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |