DE HB220 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables the prosecution of animal fighting under Delaware’s Racketeering and Organized Crime statute. Animal fighting is often linked to other forms of criminal activity, such as illegal drug distribution, gun running, prostitution, and other violent crimes. Including animal fighting in the definition of “racketeering” strengthens the ability of Delaware’s Department of Justice to prosecute those who abuse animals.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Animal Fighting And Baiting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2015-12-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |