DE HB21 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - HS 1 for HB 21 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-10 - HS 1 for HB 21 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill designates minor traffic offenses as violations, most of which 4102 of Title 21 of the Code currently classifies, by default, as misdemeanors since Title 21 generally does not designate offenses as violations, misdemeanors or felonies. The purpose of this Bill is to make the designations for traffic offenses proportional to the seriousness of the offense. An additional purpose of this Bill is to ensure that no one loses an employment opportunity solely because the person has a “misdemeanor” conviction due to a traffic offense that should not be classified as a misdemeanor.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Classification Of Certain Minor Traffic Offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | HS 1 for HB 21 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-03 | HS 1 FOR HB 21 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-30 | HS 1 for HB 21 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2009-04-09 | HS 1 for HB 21 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 7 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-08 | HS 1 for HB 21 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-07 | HS 1 for HB 21 - Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2009-03-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |