DE HB190 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act, which shall be known as the Coastal Zone Conversion Permit Act, makes changes to the Coastal Zone Act (CZA), which has not been significantly updated since its enactment almost a half century ago. The CZA, enacted in 1971, has enabled Delaware to preserve and protect our coastline, one of Delawares greatest natural resources. However, the CZA has also allowed property that has been in use by heavy industry for nearly 50 years, most suitable for similar industrial uses, to go unused unless the owner is willing to engage in the same heavy industry use or to use the property for manufacturing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Coastal Zone Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02 Signed by Governor
2017-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2017-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 NO
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 7 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 6 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 5 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 4 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 3 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 2 to HB 190 - Stricken in House
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 5 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 3 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 6 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Amendment HA 4 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Amendment HA 2 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 8 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2017-06-06 Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-18 Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback