DE HB188 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill exempts farm vehicles and trucks traveling to and from a farm, while performing farm operations, from temporary seizure requiring the vehicle to be driven to scales and being subject to forced load discharge at the direction of a police officer.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2011-06-23 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2011-06-16 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-14 | Re-Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2011-06-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |