DE HB180 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act revises HB 180 to reflect input from a wide group of stakeholders. This Substitute Act differs from HB 180 as follows:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Breaches Of Security Involving Personal Information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-17 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-07-01 Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Stricken in House
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Stricken in House
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Stricken in House
2017-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 4 Unfavorable
2017-06-27 Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-21 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-20 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 180, and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback