DE HB172 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act, the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact (PSYPACT), is an interstate compact designed to facilitate the practice of telepsychology and the temporary in-person, face-to-face practice of psychology across state boundaries. PSYPACT has become operational as at least seven states have enacted PSYPACT legislation. Through PSYPACT, licensed psychologists are able to apply for and use Association of State and Provincial Psychology Boards (ASPPB) certificates, which include the E.Passport to practice telepsychology and the Interjurisdictional Practice Certificate (IPC) to conduct temporary in-person, face-to-face practice in PSYPACT states.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Creating A Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |