DE HB170 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation, the Angel Investor Job Creation and Innovation Act for Small Technology Companies, creates an incentive for qualified angel investors to invest capital in qualified Delaware small technology companies..
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 29 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Angel Investor Job Creation And Innovation Act .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO | |
2018-04-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to SA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed with Bill | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Reconsidered by Senate | |
2018-04-25 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-04-25 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-04-25 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-04-24 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-04-24 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |
2018-04-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-07-12 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 170 - Stricken in House | |
2017-06-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |