DE HB17 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Stricken in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill extends the amount of years an identification card is valid from four (4) to eight (8) years. This bill is necessary for the Division of Motor Vehicles to maintain consistent business processes. The driver license is currently valid for eight (8) years, and this change would maintain consistency with the driver license requirement.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Drivers License Issuance Fees, Renewals, And Qualifications.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Rep. Krista Griffith [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Stricken in House | |
2021-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 17 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2020-12-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |