DE HB17 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Chapter 438, Volume 79 of the Laws of Delaware (House Bill 417 from the 147th General Assembly) provides a mechanism for financial institutions to freeze transactions that they suspect are financial exploitation of an elderly person and requires them to report suspected financial exploitation to the proper state or federal agency. Chapter 438, Volume 79 of the Laws of Delaware defined “financial institution” for the first time in Chapter 39 of Title 31. When introduced, House Bill 417 included “broker-dealer”, “investment adviser”, and “federal covered adviser” within the definition of “financial institution”; however, these terms were removed by an amendment due to concerns expressed by some of these entities. This Act restores “broker-dealer”, “investment adviser”, and “federal covered adviser” to the definition of “financial institution” following successful discussions with these entities regarding the intent and scope of Chapter 438, Volume 79 of the Laws of Delaware. The changes on lines 6 to 7 and line 10 are made to correct punctuation, in keeping with the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Adult Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-01-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |