DE HB165 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Defeated By House. Votes: 19 YES 21 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Defeated By House. Votes: 19 YES 21 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits wine producers holding a valid license within this State or another state to obtain a license and ship wine directly to Delaware consumers so long as it is done through a common carrier with a carrier permit. This Act requires that wine producers pay the taxes normally due for wines; limits the amount of wine that a direct shipper of wine can sell to a single household to 3 9-liter cases per year; and limits the total amount of wine that the direct shipper of wine can ship directly to Delaware consumers to 1,800 9-liter cases annually. This Act requires the signature of a person 21 years of age or older before delivery of the wine and to receive training regarding how to deliver wine responsibly.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Direct Purchasing And Shipment Of Wine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Defeated By House. Votes: 19 YES 21 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 165 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 165 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 7 YES 14 NO | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-09 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 13 NO 3 NOT VOTING | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 165 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 165 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 165 - Stricken in House | |
2018-06-07 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 165 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 165 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 165 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-04 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |