DE HB154 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently, claims that arise at the death of the decedent are treated the same as claims that arise after the decedent's death. This bill changes how claims that arise at the time of decedent's death are treated by including them in the same class of claims that arise during the decedent's lifetime. By making this change, claims that arise at the death of the decedent would need to be based upon the conduct of the decedent rather than the conduct of the personal representative who, at the time of decedent's death, has not yet been appointed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Creditors' Claims Against Decedents' Estates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-15 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-15 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 8 ABSENT | |
2017-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |