DE HB15 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates a requirement that all public high schools, including charter schools, shall offer at least one computer science course at the high school level by the 2020-2021 school year. Also, this bill creates a requirement that, by the 2018-2019 school year, a computer science course may satisfy one year of the total credit requirement in mathematics, excluding Algebra I, Geometry, or Algebra II or the equivalent courses. The State Board of Education shall develop guidelines addressing how computer science courses can satisfy graduation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Curriculum And Computer Science.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-03-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 5 NO 4 ABSENT
2017-03-29 Amendment SA 1 to HB 15 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT
2017-03-28 Amendment SA 1 to HB 15 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable
2017-01-24 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-01-24 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-01-18 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2017-01-05 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback