DE HB142 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds one more member, a licensed health care professional knowledgeable in the screening and identification of domestic violence cases appointed by the Council, to the Fatal Incident Review Team of the Domestic Violence Coordinating Council. The Act also updates language regarding victims of domestic violence to include survivors. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Domestic Violence Coordinating Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-25 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 142 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-06 | Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |