DE HB125 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judicial & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act will be known as the Extreme Crimes Protection Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Extreme Crimes Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |