DE HB115 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
United States Supreme Court case law and scientific research has changed how we think about juvenile delinquency. We know now that an adolescents brain is not fully developed until the mid-twenties which makes juveniles especially prone to poor decision-making. In the landmark case of Miller v. Alabama, in which the United States Supreme Court prohibited mandatory life sentences without parole for juveniles on the rationale that children are inherently different than adults, the Court relied not only scientific research but on common sense and what any parent knows: kids will be kids.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Juvenile Prosecution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |