DE HB111 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
As more healthcare services continue to move into the community, it is necessary to clearly define the scope of services offered in community settings. This legislation will update the Delaware Code to clearly define the level of medication administration permitted by unlicensed personnel and the settings in which they can administer medications. Additionally, there is a change to designate a previously undesignated paragraph, in keeping with the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Limited Lay Administration Of Medications.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-09 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |