DE HB109 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Under current Delaware law there is no recognized right to privacy in an employee or applicant’s social networking site passwords and account information. This Bill makes it unlawful for employers, subject to certain exceptions, (i) to mandate that an employee or applicant disclose password or account information that would grant the employer access the employee or applicant’s personal social networking profile or account, or (ii) to require or request that employees or applicants log onto their respective social networking site profiles or accounts to provide the employer direct access.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-07 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |