DE HB105 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes and clarifies obligations to maintain, care for, and remove trees of the owner/landlord of a manufactured home community and tenants of such community.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Housing In The State Of Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-06 | Lifted From Table in House | |
2010-05-06 | Laid On Table in House | |
2010-05-04 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-04 | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken | |
2010-04-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (MANUFACTURED HOUSING) in House with 4 Favorable | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced in House and assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee | |
2009-03-31 | Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House |