DC PR25-0770 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food Policy Council Kristy McCarron Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Food Policy Council Kristy McCarron Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-06-06 | Council | Withdrawn |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0770 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2024-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0770 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55375/Introduction/PR25-0770-Introduction.pdf |