DC PR25-0686 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Charter School Board James Sandman Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Public Charter School Board James Sandman Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0470 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-29 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0686 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |