DC PR25-0619 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Resolution R25-0425, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001680
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Resolution R25-0425, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001680
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification No. 12 to Contract NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Modification No. 12 to Contract NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Council | Resolution R25-0425, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001680 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0425 |
2024-02-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-02-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-01-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |