DC PR25-0583 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Resolution R25-0398, Effective from Jan 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Resolution R25-0398, Effective from Jan 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Council | Resolution R25-0398, Effective from Jan 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001025 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0398 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-01-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |