DC PR25-0516 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0336, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0336, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015042
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification 1 to Contract No. NFPHC-HL-23-C between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and George Washington University Medical Faculty Associates, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Modification 1 to Contract No. NFPHC-HL-23-C between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and George Washington University Medical Faculty Associates, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0336, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015042 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0336 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |