DC PR25-0356 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0205, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010041
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0205, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010041
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Contract No. CW106027 with Voyager Trucking Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0205, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010041 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0205 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-07-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |