DC PR25-0135 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0117, Effective from May 02, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0117, Effective from May 02, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Aaron L. Myers, II Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Aaron L. Myers, II Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Council | Resolution R25-0117, Effective from May 02, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001217 |
2023-07-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-05-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0117 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-05-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0135 |
2023-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0135 Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |