DC PR25-0076 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Resolution R25-0141, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007674
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Resolution R25-0141, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007674
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deputy Mayor for Public Safety and Justice Lindsey Appiah Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Deputy Mayor for Public Safety and Justice Lindsey Appiah Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Council | Resolution R25-0141, Effective from May 16, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 007674 |
2023-05-16 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0141 |
2023-05-16 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-05-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-05-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0076 |
2023-05-08 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-03-15 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-03-15 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0076 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |