DC PR25-0070 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0046, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Resolution R25-0046, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-70 would symbolically designate the 1400 Block of V Street, N.W., as St. Augustine School Way.
Title
Modification No. 0002 to Human Care Agreement No. CW100317 with Transitional Housing Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0046, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002145 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0046 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |