DC PR25-0001 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-17 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
PLEASE SEE REVISED RULES UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS.
Title
Rules of Organization and Procedure for the Council of the District of Columbia, Council Period 25, Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-03 - Council - Gray Amendment #2 (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-03 - Council - Gray Amendment #1 (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-03 - Council - Parker Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-03 - Council - Mendelson Oral Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-03 - Council - Gray Amendment #2 (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-03 - Council - Gray Amendment #1 (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-03 - Council - Parker Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-03 - Council - Mendelson Oral Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-13 | Council | Resolution R25-0001, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000238 |
2023-01-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-01-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0001 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0001 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-01-03 | Council | Gray Amendment #2 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Gray Amendment #1 |
2023-01-03 | Council | Parker Amendment |
2023-01-03 | Council | Mendelson Oral Amendment |
2023-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |