DC PR24-0546 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Resolution R24-0362, Effective from Jan 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-28 - Resolution R24-0362, Effective from Jan 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000652
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Title
District Government Family Bereavement Leave Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Council | Resolution R24-0362, Effective from Jan 18, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000652 |
2022-01-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0362 |
2022-01-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-01-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-01-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |