DC PR24-0314 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Resolution R24-0239, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011356
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Resolution R24-0239, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011356
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Supporting the Establishment of Amigos Park Resolution of 2021
Title
Sense of the Council Supporting the Establishment of Amigos Park Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-05 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | Council | Resolution R24-0239, Effective from Oct 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 011356 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0239 |
2021-10-05 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2021-10-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-07-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0314 Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |