DC PR24-0280 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DCPS Drug Testing Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
DCPS Drug Testing Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-25 | Council | Resolution R24-0136, Effective from Jun 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006482 |
2021-06-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0136 |
2021-06-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-06-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |