DC PR24-0233 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0113, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0113, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0033A with Broughton Construction Company, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0033A with Broughton Construction Company, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0113, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006109 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0113 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |