DC PR24-0218 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Resolution R24-0124, Effective from Jun 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006632
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Resolution R24-0124, Effective from Jun 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006632
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Employee Relations Board Renée Bowser Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Title
Public Employee Relations Board Renée Bowser Confirmation Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Council | Resolution R24-0124, Effective from Jun 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006632 |
2021-06-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0124 |
2021-06-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0218 |
2021-05-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-05-19 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0218 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |