DC PR24-0025 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution R24-0013, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution R24-0013, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Health Care Finance Alliance Reform and Budget Transparency Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Title
Department of Health Care Finance Alliance Reform and Budget Transparency Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Resolution R24-0013, Effective from Jan 05, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000800 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0013 |
2021-01-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-01-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |