DC PR23-0983 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Resolution R23-0628, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Resolution R23-0628, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Board of Directors Stephen Green Confirmation Resolution of2020
Title
District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Board of Directors Stephen Green Confirmation Resolution of2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Resolution R23-0628, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00143 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0628 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0983 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-11-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-11-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0983 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2020-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |