DC PR23-0937 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0629, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14807
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Chief of the Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department John Donnelly Resolution of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chief of the Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department John Donnelly Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-25CouncilResolution R23-0629, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14807
2020-12-15CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0629
2020-12-15CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-12-10CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-12-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR23-0937
2020-12-03CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2020-10-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-10-26CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0937 Published in the DC Register
2020-09-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2020-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback