DC PR23-0867 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Resolution R23-0461, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Resolution R23-0461, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concealed Pistol Licensing Review Board Membership Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Concealed Pistol Licensing Review Board Membership Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Resolution R23-0461, Effective from Jul 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9021 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0461 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |