DC PR23-0660 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Resolution R23-0378, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Resolution R23-0378, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urban Renewal Plan for the Shaw School Urban Renewal Area and Downtown Urban Renewal Area Termination Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Urban Renewal Plan for the Shaw School Urban Renewal Area and Downtown Urban Renewal Area Termination Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0378, Effective from Mar 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3543 |
2020-03-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-03-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0378 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0660 |
2020-02-25 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2020-02-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0660 Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |