DC PR23-0547 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Resolution R23-0294, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16517
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - Resolution R23-0294, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16517
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Green Finance Authority Board Lori Chatman Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
Green Finance Authority Board Lori Chatman Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | Council | Resolution R23-0294, Effective from Dec 17, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16517 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0294 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0547 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0547 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-10-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |