DC PR23-0506 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Resolution R23-0309, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Resolution R23-0309, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Housing Authority Board of Commissioners Neil Albert Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
District of Columbia Housing Authority Board of Commissioners Neil Albert Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Council | Resolution R23-0309, Effective from Jan 07, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 305 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0309 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR23-0506 |
2019-12-16 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0506 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |