DC PR23-0426 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Resolution R23-0196 Effective from July 9, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memoranda Of Agreement For Fy 2020 Wages Between The Office Of The State Superintendent Of Education, Division Of Student Transportation And Teamsters 639 And American Federation Of State, Country And Municipal Employees, District Council 20, Local 1959 Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memoranda Of Agreement For Fy 2020 Wages Between The Office Of The State Superintendent Of Education, Division Of Student Transportation And Teamsters 639 And American Federation Of State, Country And Municipal Employees, District Council 20, Local 1959 Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02CouncilResolution R23-0196 Effective from July 9, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9792
2019-07-09CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0196
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading
2019-07-09CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-07-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback