DC PR23-0333 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-18 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Board of Elections Karyn Greenfield Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Title
District of Columbia Board of Elections Karyn Greenfield Confirmation Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-18 | Council | Withdrawn |
2019-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0333 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-05-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR23-0333 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42655/Introduction/PR23-0333-Introduction.pdf |