DC PR23-0223 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution R23-0066, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4404
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Resolution R23-0066, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4404
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To approve CA 23-60
Title
Destination DC Marketing Services Contract Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Council | Resolution R23-0066, Effective from Apr 02, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4404 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0066 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |