DC PR23-0141 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0042, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2925
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Resolution R23-0042, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2925
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0025D with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Title
Modification Nos. 4 and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-17-CS-0025D with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Council | Resolution R23-0042, Effective from Mar 05, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2925 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0042 |
2019-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |