DC PR22-1137 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0661 Effective from November 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Resolution R22-0661 Effective from November 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
First Amendment To Employment Agreement Of Mr. Ronald F. Mason, Jr. As President Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
First Amendment To Employment Agreement Of Mr. Ronald F. Mason, Jr. As President Of The University Of The District Of Columbia Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Council | Resolution R22-0661 Effective from November 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13175 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0661 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |