DC PR22-1128 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Resolution R22-0680 Effective from December 14, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Resolution R22-0680 Effective from December 14, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13461
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council In Support Of Transgender, Intersex, And Gender Non-conforming Communities Resolution Of 2018
Title
Sense Of The Council In Support Of Transgender, Intersex, And Gender Non-conforming Communities Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Council | Resolution R22-0680 Effective from December 14, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13461 |
2018-12-14 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0680 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1128 Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-13 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |