DC PR22-1103 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Resolution R22-0669 Effective from December 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13724
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Resolution R22-0669 Effective from December 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13724
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Support Guideline Commission Meridel Bulle-vu Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Title
Child Support Guideline Commission Meridel Bulle-vu Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Resolution R22-0669 Effective from December 21, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13724 |
2018-12-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0669 |
2018-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-1103 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-1103 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |